This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 19:36:02 (UTC).

BROWNLEE, ANDREA MARIA OLTEAN VS ROLERAD, JASON PAUL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 BROWNLEE, ANDREA MARIA OLTEAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROLERAD, JASON PAUL. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROWNLEE, ANDREA MARIA OLTEAN

Respondent

ROLERAD, JASON PAUL

Not Classified By Court

BROWNLEE, ANDREA M

BROWNLEE, ANDREA MARIAOLTEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD SUMMONS 9/23/20 JASON ROLERAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT JASON P. ROLERAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB RESPONDENT JASON P. ROLERAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - RESPONDENT JASON P. ROLERAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD JASON P ROLERAD 9/23/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JASON ROLERAD ISSUED BY CLERK 9/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER WITHOUT CHILDREN'S ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR001675DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less