Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 12:47:03 (UTC).

BROWN, WILLIAM D VS MUSE, JESSICA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BROWN, WILLIAM D filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MUSE, JESSICA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, WILLIAM D

Defendants

MUSE, RYAN

MUSE, JESSICA

 

Court Documents

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD ON RYAN MUSE -1/15/19

01/18/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD ON RYAN MUSE -1/15/19

ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 011419

01/14/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 011419

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RYAN MUSE (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING JESSICA MUSE, CO-RES.) AT 010319

01/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RYAN MUSE (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING JESSICA MUSE, CO-RES.) AT 010319

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE (PL)

01/14/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION TO RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE (PL)

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FOR RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE

01/11/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FOR RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK FOR RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE

01/11/2019:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK FOR RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/02/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/02/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 15 DAY NOTICE

01/02/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 15 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR JESSICA MUSE

01/02/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR JESSICA MUSE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR RYAN MUSE

01/02/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR RYAN MUSE

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JESSICA MUSE (INDIVIDUAL) AT 010319

01/14/2009:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JESSICA MUSE (INDIVIDUAL) AT 010319

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD ON RYAN MUSE -1/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 011419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RYAN MUSE (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING JESSICA MUSE, CO-RES.) AT 010319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 605541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION TO RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FOR RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK FOR RYAN AND JESSICA MUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 603623

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $212.00 Balance Remaining $212.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case 272019CC000002CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JESSICA MUSE (INDIVIDUAL) AT 010319

    Read MoreRead Less