Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 18:17:41 (UTC).

BROOKSVILLE CHIROPRACTIC, INC. Et Al VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 BROOKSVILLE CHIROPRACTIC, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROOKSVILLE CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

LOVETT, JULIANNA ROSE

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRINCE, MICHAEL RYAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS RE: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - PIONNE CORBIN, AT 032819, VIA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

03/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS RE: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - PIONNE CORBIN, AT 032819, VIA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - PTC 050119 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - PTC 050119 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO (BLANK)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS RE: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - PIONNE CORBIN, AT 032819, VIA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - PTC 050119 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $90.00 Receipt Number H 616959

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $90.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019SC000656SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less