This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/01/2019 at 13:15:54 (UTC).

BRANCIFORTE, VINCENT VS SARGENT, AMY

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 BRANCIFORTE, VINCENT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SARGENT, AMY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANCIFORTE, VINCENT

Defendant

SARGENT, AMY

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

05/28/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY DTD 052819*

05/28/2019:JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY DTD 052819*

COURT WORKSHEET - WRIT OF POSSESSION GRANTED - CLERK TO PREPARE

05/28/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - WRIT OF POSSESSION GRANTED - CLERK TO PREPARE

PL'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

05/21/2019:PL'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

MOTION FILED TO DETERMINE WHAT RENT IS DUE-FILED BY DEF AMY SARGENT

05/16/2019:MOTION FILED TO DETERMINE WHAT RENT IS DUE-FILED BY DEF AMY SARGENT

ANSWER FILED BY DEF AMY SARGENT

05/16/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEF AMY SARGENT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON AMY SARGENT 051319

05/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON AMY SARGENT 051319

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/09/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/09/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION W/15 DAY NOTICE

05/09/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION W/15 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO AMY SARGENT

05/09/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO AMY SARGENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 628165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY DTD 052819*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - WRIT OF POSSESSION GRANTED - CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PL'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FILED TO DETERMINE WHAT RENT IS DUE-FILED BY DEF AMY SARGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY DEF AMY SARGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION W/15 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO AMY SARGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 625425

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Case 272019CC000617CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less