This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/09/2019 at 16:16:08 (UTC).

BOTTORFF, RAYMOND C VS MILLER, CLYDE H Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 BOTTORFF, RAYMOND C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MILLER, CLYDE H. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOTTORFF, RAYMOND C

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

MILLER, CLYDE H

STEADY, DOUGLAS P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANELLO, DANIEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISPENSE WITH MEDIATION AND SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL - GRANTED - DTD 042320

04/23/2020:ORDER FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISPENSE WITH MEDIATION AND SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL - GRANTED - DTD 042320

REPLY or ANSWER TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLNTF

03/04/2020:REPLY or ANSWER TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (SEE DCOUMENT) FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/06/2020:NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (SEE DCOUMENT) FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER FILED SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AT 3:00 PM ON JUNE 16, 2020 - DTD 042320

04/23/2020:ORDER FILED SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AT 3:00 PM ON JUNE 16, 2020 - DTD 042320

MOTION FILED TO DISPENSE W/ MEDIATION AND SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLNTF

03/25/2020:MOTION FILED TO DISPENSE W/ MEDIATION AND SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES OF PLNTF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

03/03/2020:NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES OF PLNTF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/02/2020:NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

REPLY or ANSWER TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLNTF

01/03/2020:REPLY or ANSWER TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/03/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

01/21/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, CLYDE H MILLER

12/19/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, CLYDE H MILLER

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR DEFS, DOUGLAS P STEADY AND CLYDE H MILLER FILED BY PLNTF

02/27/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR DEFS, DOUGLAS P STEADY AND CLYDE H MILLER FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DOUGLAS P STEADY

12/19/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DOUGLAS P STEADY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF, DOUGLAS P STEADY

01/24/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF, DOUGLAS P STEADY

NOTICE OF - ACCEPTANCE OF PLNTFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 022720 FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/13/2020:NOTICE OF - ACCEPTANCE OF PLNTFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 022720 FILED BY DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

01/24/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

JOINT STIP FOR DISMISS W/PREJ - SIGNED BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS, DOUGLAS P STEADY AND CLYDE H MILLER

04/24/2020:JOINT STIP FOR DISMISS W/PREJ - SIGNED BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS, DOUGLAS P STEADY AND CLYDE H MILLER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

11/25/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PENA GARCIA & DIZ PLLC AS COUNSEL FOR DEF DOUGLAS P STEADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PENA GARCIA & DIZ PLLC AS COUNSEL FOR DEF CLYDE H MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 657003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DOUGLAS P STEADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 656495

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DOUGLAS P STEADY ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CLYDE H MILLER ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001295CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANELLO, DANIEL JOHN