This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/29/2021 at 21:07:47 (UTC).

BOEBEL, ROBERT O, SCHNEIDER, RUTH B Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 BOEBEL, ROBERT O, SCHNEIDER, RUTH B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

BOEBEL, ROBERT O

Decedent

SCHNEIDER, RUTH B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Decedent Attorney

GERMANN, AMANDA J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - COMMISSION DTD 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT ( ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ( ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 744286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDECLINATION - TO SERVE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REP AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND AND DISCLAIMER AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY RUTH B SCHNEIDER (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH RUTH SCHNEIDER (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER FOR OATH OF WITNESS FOR PROOF OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000864CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERMANN, AMANDA J.