Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/12/2019 at 13:15:33 (UTC).

BIG TREE MOBILE HOME & RV PARK VS ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 BIG TREE MOBILE HOME RV PARK filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIG TREE MOBILE HOME & RV PARK

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

GATES, KATELYN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION

04/24/2020:NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KATELYN GATES (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 032119

03/25/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KATELYN GATES (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 032119

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 032119

03/25/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 032119

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

03/19/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/19/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - KATELYN GATES

03/19/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - KATELYN GATES

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

03/19/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

FIVE DAY DEMAND FOR PAYMENT NOTICE

03/19/2019:FIVE DAY DEMAND FOR PAYMENT NOTICE

PETITION FOR EVICTION

03/19/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KATELYN GATES (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 032119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 032119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - KATELYN GATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY DEMAND FOR PAYMENT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • EVICTION SUMMONS Active Process Deleted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case 272019CC000387CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less