Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 13:14:31 (UTC).

BIG TREE MOBILE HOME & RV PARK VS ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS, Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 BIG TREE MOBILE HOME RV PARK filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIG TREE MOBILE HOME & RV PARK

Defendants

TOFT, NICHOLAS

DEANE, JUSTIN

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS,

 

Court Documents

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO JUSTIN DEANE, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS N/K/A NICHOLAS TOFT- CLERK DEFAULT

02/19/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO JUSTIN DEANE, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS N/K/A NICHOLAS TOFT- CLERK DEFAULT

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - JUDGMENT TO JUSTIN DEANE, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS, NICHOLAS TOFT

02/04/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - JUDGMENT TO JUSTIN DEANE, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS, NICHOLAS TOFT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JUSTINE DEANE 012919 - POSTED

02/01/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JUSTINE DEANE 012919 - POSTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

01/28/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 012419

01/25/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 012419

DOCUMENTS FILED - AGAINST JUSTIN DEANE AND ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA NICHOLAS TOFT

01/24/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - AGAINST JUSTIN DEANE AND ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA NICHOLAS TOFT

PL'S MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

01/24/2019:PL'S MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA NICHOLAS TOFT 011519

01/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA NICHOLAS TOFT 011519

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JUSTIN DEANE 011619

01/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JUSTIN DEANE 011619

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO DEFENDANTS

01/15/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO DEFENDANTS

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/15/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

01/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 5 DAY NOTICE

01/15/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 5 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT (PL)

01/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT (PL)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JUSTIN DEANE (PL)

01/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JUSTIN DEANE (PL)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO JUSTIN DEANE, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS N/K/A NICHOLAS TOFT- CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - JUDGMENT TO JUSTIN DEANE, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS, NICHOLAS TOFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JUSTINE DEANE 012919 - POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 607653

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 012419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - AGAINST JUSTIN DEANE AND ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA NICHOLAS TOFT

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 605614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JUSTIN DEANE (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case 272019CC000070CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less