Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:37:32 (UTC).

BIELLA, JOHN P JR VS BIELLA, GERALDINE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 BIELLA, JOHN P JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BIELLA, GERALDINE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BIELLA, JOHN P JR

Respondent

BIELLA, GERALDINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOORD, STACY MARIE

Respondent Attorney

NAPOLITANO, JOHN EMANUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JOHN E. NAPOLITANO, ESQ. OBO RESPONDENT GERALDINE BIELLA AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES TO HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT'S DRIVER LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB -WIFE'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketANSWER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY, NO MINOR CHILDREN AND OTHER RELIEF-WIFE'S

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DRIVERS LICENSE - PETITIONER/HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - ATTORNEY MOORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY NO MINOR CHILDREN AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number H 722910

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000374DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAPOLITANO, JOHN EMANUEL