Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/26/2019 at 13:15:48 (UTC).

BESHAI PROPERTIES, LLC VS ALL OTHERS Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 BESHAI PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHERS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BESHAI PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

ALL OTHERS

MILLER, ASHLEY

DEAN, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 051719

05/20/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 051719

DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE - AGAINST DEFS, ASHLEY MILLER, JOSHUA DEAN & ALL OTHERS - DTD 051719

05/20/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE - AGAINST DEFS, ASHLEY MILLER, JOSHUA DEAN & ALL OTHERS - DTD 051719

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY BESHAI PROPERTIES, LLC, BETH BESHAI

05/15/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY BESHAI PROPERTIES, LLC, BETH BESHAI

ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT ASHLEY MILLER AND JOSHUA DEAN

05/13/2019:ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT ASHLEY MILLER AND JOSHUA DEAN

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL OTHERS (SUBSTS. SERV., BY SERVING ASHLEY MILLER, CO-RESIDENT) AT 050619

05/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL OTHERS (SUBSTS. SERV., BY SERVING ASHLEY MILLER, CO-RESIDENT) AT 050619

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ASHLEY MILLER (INDIVIDUAL) AT 050619

05/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ASHLEY MILLER (INDIVIDUAL) AT 050619

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOSHUA DEAN (INDIVIDUAL) AT 050619

05/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOSHUA DEAN (INDIVIDUAL) AT 050619

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/03/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/02/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT JOSHUA DEAN

05/02/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT JOSHUA DEAN

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ASHLEY MILLER

05/02/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ASHLEY MILLER

PETITION FOR EVICTION 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

05/02/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALL OTHERS

05/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALL OTHERS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSHUA DEAN (PL)

05/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSHUA DEAN (PL)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ASHLEY MILLER (PL)

05/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ASHLEY MILLER (PL)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 051719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE - AGAINST DEFS, ASHLEY MILLER, JOSHUA DEAN & ALL OTHERS - DTD 051719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 627067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY BESHAI PROPERTIES, LLC, BETH BESHAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT ASHLEY MILLER AND JOSHUA DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ALL OTHERS (SUBSTS. SERV., BY SERVING ASHLEY MILLER, CO-RESIDENT) AT 050619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ASHLEY MILLER (INDIVIDUAL) AT 050619

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ASHLEY MILLER (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Payment received: $236.00 Receipt Number H 624394

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $236.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $236.00 Balance Remaining $236.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Case 272019CC000597CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BESHAI PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant