This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/28/2021 at 21:10:37 (UTC).

BENZEL, RICHARD JOHN, POOLE, COLEEN S Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 BENZEL, RICHARD JOHN, POOLE, COLEEN S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Claimant

OAK HILL HOSPITAL

Decedents

BENZEL, RICHARD JOHN

KEMP AND ASSOCIATES INC

Not Classified By Court

POOLE, DEWAIN A

POOLE, COLEEN S

BENZELL, BARBARA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

DIXON, DRAVIN BAITH

STINSON, SHERRI MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEstate Claim for $630.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY OAK HILL HOSPITAL IN THE AMOUNT OF $630.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE SHERRI M. STINSONESQ. ON BEHALF OF BARBARA J. BENZEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF RICHARD J. BENZEL ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 733988

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE DRAVIN DIXON ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF OF FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH RICHARD J BENZEL (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000591CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEMP & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where OAK HILL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIXON, DRAVIN BAITH