Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 21:08:29 (UTC).

BENSON, KATHLEEN S, BENSON, RODNEY E Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2021 BENSON, KATHLEEN S, BENSON, RODNEY E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

BENSON, RODNEY E

Not Classified By Court

BENSON, KATHLEEN S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

EVANS, KARA LYN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE KARA EVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT KATHLEEN S. BENSON ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF RODNEY E. BENSON ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION WITH 2021-CP-337 (WFO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 728374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY RODNEY E BENSON (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH RODNEY E BENSON (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000425CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF RODNEY E BENSON (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000337CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS , KARA LYN