Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:16:18 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL PROPERTIES SERIES 2 VS BUTLER, JAIME MOLINA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 BENEFICIAL PROPERTIES SERIES 2 filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BUTLER, JAIME MOLINA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL PROPERTIES SERIES 2

Defendant

BUTLER, JAIME MOLINA

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - DTD 041819

04/22/2019:ORDER GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - DTD 041819

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JAIME MOLINA BUTLER

04/05/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JAIME MOLINA BUTLER

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (BLANK)

04/04/2019:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (BLANK)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - FILED BY PLNTF

04/04/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT - FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - FILED BY PLNTF

04/01/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - FILED BY PLNTF

RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032219

03/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032219

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - JAIME MOLINA BUTLER

03/20/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - JAIME MOLINA BUTLER

SUMMONS ISSUED JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (BLANK)

PETITION FOR EVICTION

03/14/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT - FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL - JAIME MOLINA BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number H 617003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JAIME MOLINA BUTLER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000393CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less