Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 12:46:21 (UTC).

BEDI, AMRITA VS MORGENSTERN, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 BEDI, AMRITA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MORGENSTERN, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEDI, AMRITA

Defendant

MORGENSTERN, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PL DTD 012219

01/22/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PL DTD 012219

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 011719

01/18/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 011719

DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE AGAINST MICHAEL MORGENSTERN DTD 011719

01/18/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE AGAINST MICHAEL MORGENSTERN DTD 011719

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON MICHAEL MORGENSTERN (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING STEVE BUTLER, CO-RES.) AT 010419

01/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON MICHAEL MORGENSTERN (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING STEVE BUTLER, CO-RES.) AT 010419

ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF, AMRITA BEDI IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE FILED

01/14/2019:ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF, AMRITA BEDI IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE FILED

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FOR MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

01/14/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FOR MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

ANSWER TO EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

01/07/2019:ANSWER TO EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/03/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

01/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/03/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION

01/03/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PL DTD 012219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 606816

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 011719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE AGAINST MICHAEL MORGENSTERN DTD 011719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON MICHAEL MORGENSTERN (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING STEVE BUTLER, CO-RES.) AT 010419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FROM PLAINTIFF, AMRITA BEDI IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FOR MICHAEL MORGENSTERN

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Payment received: $203.35 Receipt Number H 603834

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $1.35 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case 272019CC000012CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less