This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/07/2021 at 18:20:00 (UTC).

BATTEN, TEENA VS SHENOSKY, DEBORAH

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 BATTEN, TEENA filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against SHENOSKY, DEBORAH. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E, HITZEMANN, KURT and KURT HITZEMANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

KURT HITZEMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BATTEN, TEENA

BATTAN, ELIZABETH

Defendants

SHENOSKY, DEBORAH

MARTINEZ, APRIL

SHENOSKY, LARRY

MARTINEZ, ANTHONY LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HENGESBACH, SETON TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO DISMISS IS GRANTED DTD 092721

09/30/2021:ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO DISMISS IS GRANTED DTD 092721

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

09/27/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SETON R. HENGESBACH, ESQ., AS ATTY OF RECORD FOR DEF'S, DEBORAH SHENOSKY AND LARRY SHENOSKI, AND DESIG OF EMAIL seton@naturecoastlaw.com

09/27/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SETON R. HENGESBACH, ESQ., AS ATTY OF RECORD FOR DEF'S, DEBORAH SHENOSKY AND LARRY SHENOSKI, AND DESIG OF EMAIL seton@naturecoastlaw.com

SHOW CAUSE ORDER SERVED ON: APRIL MARTINEZ 091721 ALSO SERVED, REPLIVIN COMPLAINT

09/23/2021:SHOW CAUSE ORDER SERVED ON: APRIL MARTINEZ 091721 ALSO SERVED, REPLIVIN COMPLAINT

SHOW CAUSE ORDER SERVED ON: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ 091721 ALSO SERVED, REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

09/23/2021:SHOW CAUSE ORDER SERVED ON: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ 091721 ALSO SERVED, REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR APRIL MARTINEZ - DTD 09142021

09/14/2021:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR APRIL MARTINEZ - DTD 09142021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR LARRY SHENOSKY - DTD 09142021

09/14/2021:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR LARRY SHENOSKY - DTD 09142021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEBORAH SHENOSKY - DTD 09142021

09/14/2021:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEBORAH SHENOSKY - DTD 09142021

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ PTC 11/02/2021 @9:00 AM CRTRM B (PL )

09/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ PTC 11/02/2021 @9:00 AM CRTRM B (PL )

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LARRY SHENOSKY PTC 11/02/2021 @9:00 AM CRTRM B (PL )

09/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LARRY SHENOSKY PTC 11/02/2021 @9:00 AM CRTRM B (PL )

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRAH SHENOSKY PTC 11/02/2021 @9:00 AM CRTRM B (PL )

09/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRAH SHENOSKY PTC 11/02/2021 @9:00 AM CRTRM B (PL )

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LARRY SHENOSKY ~ BLANK *

09/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LARRY SHENOSKY ~ BLANK *

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ ~ BLANK *

09/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ ~ BLANK *

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBORAH SHENOSKY ~ BLANK*

09/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBORAH SHENOSKY ~ BLANK*

DOCUMENTS FILED - ITEM DESCRIPTION LIST FOR ELIZABETH BATTEN

09/08/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - ITEM DESCRIPTION LIST FOR ELIZABETH BATTEN

DOCUMENTS FILED - ITEM DESCRIPTION LIST FOR TEENA BATTTEN

09/08/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - ITEM DESCRIPTION LIST FOR TEENA BATTTEN

REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

09/08/2021:REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/02/2021 09:00; Judge: HITZEMANN, KURT; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: HERNANDO COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: HENGESBACH, SETON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/02/2021 09:00; Judge: HITZEMANN, KURT; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: HERNANDO COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: HENGESBACH, SETON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO DISMISS IS GRANTED DTD 092721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SETON R. HENGESBACH, ESQ., AS ATTY OF RECORD FOR DEF'S, DEBORAH SHENOSKY AND LARRY SHENOSKI, AND DESIG OF EMAIL seton@naturecoastlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHOW CAUSE ORDER SERVED ON: APRIL MARTINEZ 091721 ALSO SERVED, REPLIVIN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHOW CAUSE ORDER SERVED ON: ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ 091721 ALSO SERVED, REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR APRIL MARTINEZ - DTD 09142021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ANTHONY LUIS MARTINEZ - DTD 09142021

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLEVIN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $453.00 Receipt Number H 754443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $453.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent AMPT scheduled on 11/2/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KURT HITZEMANN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent AMPT scheduled on 10/12/2021 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge KURT HITZEMANN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $453.00 Balance Remaining $453.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002330SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SETON T HENGESBACH, ESQ