This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 21:03:40 (UTC).

BARRIENTOS, MARIE, RETTIG, MICHAEL JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 BARRIENTOS, MARIE, RETTIG, MICHAEL JOHN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARRIENTOS, MARIE

Decedent

RETTIG, MICHAEL JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketUNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED ON MARIA BARBARA BARRIENTOS (PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN HAS BEEN DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCLERK CORRESPONDENCE TO: MARIA BARBARA BARRIENTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT SUNCOAST ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL MERRITT FUNERAL HOME PAID IN FULL2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH MICHAEL JOHN RETTIG ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 699575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001024CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less