Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:08:12 (UTC).

BARNES, DEBRA A, CONLON, KAYLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 BARNES, DEBRA A, CONLON, KAYLA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

BARNES, DEBRA A

Not Classified By Court

CONLON, KAYLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KELESKE, JOSHUA THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number H 728525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED WAIVING BOND DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH DEBRA A. BARNES ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT KAYLA CONLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT DYLAN BARNES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH DEBRA A. BARNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 723374

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000282CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELESKE , JOSHUA THOMAS