This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 20:03:18 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS ROITHMEIER, ANDREW M

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROITHMEIER, ANDREW M. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

ROITHMEIER, ANDREW M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREW M ROITHMEIER - PTC 031319 AT 10:30 CRTRM B

02/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREW M ROITHMEIER - PTC 031319 AT 10:30 CRTRM B

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

01/28/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

SUMMONS ISSUED ANDREW M ROITHMEIER (BLANK)

01/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ANDREW M ROITHMEIER (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

01/28/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2107.20

01/28/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2107.20

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON ANDREW M ROITHMEIER - MOVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREW M ROITHMEIER - PTC 031319 AT 10:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 608064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ANDREW M ROITHMEIER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2107.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Case 272019SC000285SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less