This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/22/2019 at 18:17:47 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS MORGAN, DEBRA S

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORGAN, DEBRA S. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

MORGAN, DEBRA S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OROVITZ, ROBERT JAY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON DEBRA S MORGAN (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING WILLIAM MORGAN, HUSBAND) AT 041119

04/15/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON DEBRA S MORGAN (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING WILLIAM MORGAN, HUSBAND) AT 041119

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRA S MORGAN - PTC 051519 AT 9:45

04/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRA S MORGAN - PTC 051519 AT 9:45

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

03/29/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

SUMMONS ISSUED DEBRA S MORGAN (BLANK)

03/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DEBRA S MORGAN (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/29/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,353.51

03/29/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,353.51

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON DEBRA S MORGAN (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING WILLIAM MORGAN, HUSBAND) AT 041119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRA S MORGAN - PTC 051519 AT 9:45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 619137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DEBRA S MORGAN (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,353.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case 272019SC000799SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less