This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/05/2019 at 18:20:31 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS ADAMS, TYRONE

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADAMS, TYRONE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

ADAMS, TYRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OROVITZ, ROBERT JAY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SUBSTITUTE SERVIED FOR TYRONE ADAMS ON 03/23/19

03/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SUBSTITUTE SERVIED FOR TYRONE ADAMS ON 03/23/19

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TYRONE ADAMS - PTC 052219 AT 10:30 CRTRM B

03/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TYRONE ADAMS - PTC 052219 AT 10:30 CRTRM B

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4658.80

03/12/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4658.80

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

03/12/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

COVER SHEET

03/12/2019:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE ADAMS (BLANK)

03/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE ADAMS (BLANK)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SUBSTITUTE SERVIED FOR TYRONE ADAMS ON 03/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TYRONE ADAMS - PTC 052219 AT 10:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 615951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4658.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE ADAMS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case 272019SC000643SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less