This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 18:31:03 (UTC).

BANKS, ANA R VS BANKS, AARON K

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 BANKS, ANA R filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BANKS, AARON K. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BANKS, ANA R

Respondent

BANKS, AARON K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISS MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED SETTING FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE 6/26/20 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF - LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE SCHEDULG MEETING W/SELF 6/2/20 @ 11:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY - AARON BANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY - ANA BANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY - ANA BANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS - JOHN DELLATORRE (FOR ANA BANKS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 683574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR000881DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less