This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 20:13:02 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS MARSCHNER, PATRICIA V

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARSCHNER, PATRICIA V. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

MARSCHNER, PATRICIA V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADELMAN, JERALYN SUE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICIA V MARSCHNER - PTC 041019 AT 11:15 CRTRM C

02/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICIA V MARSCHNER - PTC 041019 AT 11:15 CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED PATRICA V MARSCHNER - BLANK

02/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PATRICA V MARSCHNER - BLANK

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,684.55

02/05/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,684.55

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

02/05/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

COVER SHEET

02/05/2019:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICIA V MARSCHNER - PTC 041019 AT 11:15 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 609977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED PATRICA V MARSCHNER - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,684.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Case 272019SC000358SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less