This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 12:01:40 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, LOEDEL, JAMES D Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 BANK OF AMERICA, LOEDEL, JAMES D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Claimant

BANK OF AMERICA

Decedent

LOEDEL, PAULINE R

Not Classified By Court

LOEDEL, JAMES D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION/RELEASE OF CLAIM BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LEGAL PUBLICATION TAMPA BAY TIMES ON 05/24/2020 AND 05/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE TO CREDITORS ON THE AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $513.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $513.89 BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCOPY/SEARCH REQUEST FORM COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH PAULINE R. LOEDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY PAULINE R. LOEDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION JAMES D. LOEDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT JAMES D. LOEDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000415CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD