Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:17:46 (UTC).

AUTOMOTIVE CREDIT CORPORATION VS DISCUA, OSCAR

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 AUTOMOTIVE CREDIT CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against DISCUA, OSCAR. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOMOTIVE CREDIT CORPORATION

Defendant

DISCUA, OSCAR

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

03/14/2019:COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: OSCAR DISCUA

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: OSCAR DISCUA

SUMMONS ISSUED OSCAR DISCUA (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED OSCAR DISCUA (BLANK)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: OSCAR DISCUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 617009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED OSCAR DISCUA (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000394CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less