This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 12:21:06 (UTC).

ASHWORTH, MARK LEE VS LANDRY, JOHN MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 ASHWORTH, MARK LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANDRY, JOHN MICHAEL. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHWORTH, MARK LEE

Defendant

LANDRY, JOHN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGAZINE, JAMES LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

DIAZ, ERIN MOSS

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC AND BIGGERS FAMILY MEDICINE FILED BY DEF

08/04/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC AND BIGGERS FAMILY MEDICINE FILED BY DEF

SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO DEFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

07/28/2020:SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO DEFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARK ASHWORTH ON 072420 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

07/23/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARK ASHWORTH ON 072420 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (PARTIAL - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/02/2020:NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (PARTIAL - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF RE VERIZON WIRELESS FILED BY PLNTF

05/20/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF RE VERIZON WIRELESS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARK ASHWORTH ON 072420 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

04/28/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARK ASHWORTH ON 072420 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

EXHIBITS - "B"

03/31/2020:EXHIBITS - "B"

MOTION TO COMPEL PLNTFS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGS AND RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEF

03/31/2020:MOTION TO COMPEL PLNTFS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGS AND RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

03/19/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEFENDANT JOHN MICHAEL LANDRY BY AND THROUGH THE UNDERSIGNED ATTORNEYS, RESPONDS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SERVED

03/09/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEFENDANT JOHN MICHAEL LANDRY BY AND THROUGH THE UNDERSIGNED ATTORNEYS, RESPONDS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SERVED

INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS -FILED BY DEF

03/09/2020:INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS -FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ERIN M DIAZ ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF

03/02/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ERIN M DIAZ ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS TPAcrtpleadings@wickersmith.com, FILED BY DEFENDANT

02/12/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS TPAcrtpleadings@wickersmith.com, FILED BY DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY K RECLA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

01/27/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY K RECLA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON JHN MICHAEL LANDRY 010620

01/14/2020:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON JHN MICHAEL LANDRY 010620

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

12/13/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN MICHAEL LANDRY (BLANK)

12/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN MICHAEL LANDRY (BLANK)

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

12/13/2019:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC AND BIGGERS FAMILY MEDICINE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO DEFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF RE TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC AND BIGGERS FAMILY MEDICINE FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC AND BIGGERS FAMILY MEDICINE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARK ASHWORTH ON 072420 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOHN M LANDRY ON 070620 AT 11:00 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (PARTIAL) RE ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP - RADIOLOGY STUDIES, MEDICAL AND BILLING RECORDS AND VERIZON WIRELESS-CELL PHONE RECORDS FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (PARTIAL - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE 2019-CA-1085 TO CIRCUIT JUDGE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS DTD 052720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - VERIZON WIRELESS FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOHN MICHAEL LANDRY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001401CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIN M DIAZ, ESQ