This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 12:02:36 (UTC).

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVIC, CALDWELL, NANCY A Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVIC, CALDWELL, NANCY A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALDWELL, NANCY A

Claimants

TRUIST BANK

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVIC

Decedent

WHITE, STANLEY W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SASSER, DAVID CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $3,455.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - SUNTRUST/TRUIST BANK $3,455.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LEGAL PUBLICATION TAMPA BAY TIMES ON 05/03/2020 AND 05/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $856.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $929.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $856.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF $929.37

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE OR BOOK 3832 PG 855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH STANLEY WILLARD WHITE (ORIGINAL) OR BOOK 3832 PG 856

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH STANLEY WILLARD WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND FOR DETERMINATION OF HOMESTEAD PROPERTY AND EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 679279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000412CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SASSER, DAVID CHARLES