This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/28/2020 at 21:13:04 (UTC).

ARCIDIACONO, DENNIS VS PAULUS, JOSHUA A Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 ARCIDIACONO, DENNIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAULUS, JOSHUA A. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCIDIACONO, DENNIS

Defendants

PAULUS, JOSHUA A

PAULUS, SCOTT C

SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACYSZYN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

ORDER FILED - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER OF CASE CLOSURES DTD 123119

12/31/2019:ORDER FILED - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER OF CASE CLOSURES DTD 123119

NOTICE OF - COMPLIANCE W/ RULE 1.720 FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

09/25/2019:NOTICE OF - COMPLIANCE W/ RULE 1.720 FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

06/03/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST SCOTT C PAULUS

04/16/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST SCOTT C PAULUS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SECOND - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

04/05/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SECOND - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (CLERK'S DEFAULT) AGAINST DEF JOSHUA A PAULUS - FILED BY PLNTF

03/20/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT (CLERK'S DEFAULT) AGAINST DEF JOSHUA A PAULUS - FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED ON DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MTN TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLNTFS COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS COUNT III IS ABATED PENDING RESOLUTION OF COUNT I AND II AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 030819

03/08/2019:ORDER FILED ON DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MTN TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLNTFS COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS COUNT III IS ABATED PENDING RESOLUTION OF COUNT I AND II AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 030819

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF

02/25/2019:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

02/12/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

02/05/2019:RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

INTERROGATORY NTC OF SERVICE OF INTERROGS TO PLNTF

01/29/2019:INTERROGATORY NTC OF SERVICE OF INTERROGS TO PLNTF

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY 010719

01/21/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY 010719

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SCOTT C PAULUS

12/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SCOTT C PAULUS

INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SCOTT C PAULUS

12/21/2018:INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SCOTT C PAULUS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, JOSHUA A PAULUS

12/21/2018:REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, JOSHUA A PAULUS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO SCOTT C PAULUS

12/21/2018:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO SCOTT C PAULUS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQEUST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO JOSHUA A PAULUS

12/21/2018:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQEUST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO JOSHUA A PAULUS

COVER SHEET

12/21/2018:COVER SHEET

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER OF CASE CLOSURES DTD 123119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - FULL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - COMPLIANCE W/ RULE 1.720 FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 4, 2019 @9:30 AT THE LAW OFFICE OF LUCAS/MAGAZINE 2109 COMMERCIAL WAY SPRING HILL FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (THIRD - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO SCOTT C PAULUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQEUST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO JOSHUA A PAULUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SCOTT C PAULUS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSHUA A PAULUS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCase 272018CA001492CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN MACYSZYN