Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/15/2019 at 13:18:07 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS SINGH, KEVIN V

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against SINGH, KEVIN V. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

SINGH, KEVIN V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON: KEVIN V SINGH

02/19/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON: KEVIN V SINGH

CORRESPONDENCE DATED 010719 TO ATTY PIROOZSHAD FROM PASCO COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

02/19/2019:CORRESPONDENCE DATED 010719 TO ATTY PIROOZSHAD FROM PASCO COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DTD 122818

02/19/2019:EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DTD 122818

CORRESPONDENCE DATED 122218 TO JUDGE SESTAK FROM JEFF PIROOZSHAD ESQ

02/19/2019:CORRESPONDENCE DATED 122218 TO JUDGE SESTAK FROM JEFF PIROOZSHAD ESQ

PLNTFS EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/19/2019:PLNTFS EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KEVIN V SINGH AKA KEVIN SINGH

02/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KEVIN V SINGH AKA KEVIN SINGH

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KEVIN V SINGH AKA KEVIN SINGH (BLANK)

02/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KEVIN V SINGH AKA KEVIN SINGH (BLANK)

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

02/19/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

COVER SHEET - CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS

02/19/2019:COVER SHEET - CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS

EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DTD 122818

02/19/2019:EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DTD 122818

DOCUMENTS FILED - CASE ABSTRACT FILING

02/19/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - CASE ABSTRACT FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • -- END OF TRANSFERRED DOCUMENTS --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Payment received: $300.00 Receipt Number H 612283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON: KEVIN V SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE DATED 010719 TO ATTY PIROOZSHAD FROM PASCO COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DTD 122818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE DATED 122218 TO JUDGE SESTAK FROM JEFF PIROOZSHAD ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLNTFS EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KEVIN V SINGH AKA KEVIN SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KEVIN V SINGH AKA KEVIN SINGH (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET - CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLNTFS EX-PARTE MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DTD 122818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - CASE ABSTRACT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • -- THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS WERE TRANSFERRED FROM PASCO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Case 272019CC000252CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric