Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:17:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS MONDOR, CHRISTOPHER Z

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against MONDOR, CHRISTOPHER Z. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

MONDOR, CHRISTOPHER Z

Not Classified By Court

MONDOR, CHRISTOPHE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTOPHER Z MONDOR AKA CHRISTOPHE MONDOR

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTOPHER Z MONDOR AKA CHRISTOPHE MONDOR

COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

03/14/2019:COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER Z MONDOR (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER Z MONDOR (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTOPHER Z MONDOR AKA CHRISTOPHE MONDOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 616996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER Z MONDOR (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000391CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less