This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/13/2021 at 13:26:37 (UTC).

AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC VS ROBLES, JERREL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against ROBLES, JERREL. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

ROBLES, JERREL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WASKIEWICZ, MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JERREL ROBLES

02/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JERREL ROBLES

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

02/11/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JERREL ROBLES (BLANK)

02/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JERREL ROBLES (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

02/11/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR JERREL ROBLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $85.00 Receipt Number H 721220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $85.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 720438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JERREL ROBLES (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CC000192CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Credit Acceptance, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Waskiewicz, Michael S.