This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 12:43:33 (UTC).

ALLERGY & ASTHMA CLINIC OF EAS, PESCE, BERNARD JOSEPH Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 ALLERGY ASTHMA CLINIC OF EAS, PESCE, BERNARD JOSEPH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Claimants

VERIZON WIRELESS

ALLERGY & ASTHMA CLINIC OF EAS

Not Classified By Court

PESCE, MATTHEW JAMES

Decedent

PESCE, BERNARD JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ARKOVICH, CHRISTIE DEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $858.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $858.91 VERIZON WIRELESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $609.60 ALLERGY & ASTHMA CLINIC OF EAST LANSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $609.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF BERNARD JOSEPH PESCE ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $6.00 Receipt Number H 687124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 683652

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES AFFID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000535CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allergy Associates, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARKOVICH, CHRISTIE DEE