This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/01/2021 at 23:28:26 (UTC).

ADAMS, ALEXANDRA Et Al VS DUNN, BARBARA ANN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 ADAMS, ALEXANDRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DUNN, BARBARA ANN. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMRICK, NIKKI

ADAMS, ALEXANDRA

Defendant

DUNN, BARBARA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, DENNIS

Defendant Attorney

ALBEE, SCOTT BENNETT

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSES TO DEFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF NIKKI EMRICK

10/05/2021:SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSES TO DEFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF NIKKI EMRICK

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JEFFERY RAY BROOKS ON 083021 AT 2:00 (AMENDED) FILED BY PLNTFS

08/25/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JEFFERY RAY BROOKS ON 083021 AT 2:00 (AMENDED) FILED BY PLNTFS

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JERRY W EDWARDS ON 082621 AT 11:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

07/22/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JERRY W EDWARDS ON 082621 AT 11:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JEFFERY RAY BROOKS ON 082621 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

07/22/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JEFFERY RAY BROOKS ON 082621 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF ALEXANDRA ADAMS

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF ALEXANDRA ADAMS

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF AD.E A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF AD.E A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY AN.E A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY AN.E A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF N.E. A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF N.E. A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF NIKKI EMRICK

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF NIKKI EMRICK

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NIKKI EMRICK ON 071921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

06/21/2021:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NIKKI EMRICK ON 071921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ALEXANDRA ADAMS ON 071921 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

06/21/2021:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ALEXANDRA ADAMS ON 071921 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ALEXANDRA ADAMS ON 071921 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

06/21/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ALEXANDRA ADAMS ON 071921 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NIKKI EMRICK ON 071921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

06/21/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NIKKI EMRICK ON 071921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF BARBARA ANN DUNN ON 071521 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

06/17/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF BARBARA ANN DUNN ON 071521 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROD OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/15/2021:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROD OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROD OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/15/2021:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROD OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROD OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/15/2021:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROD OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCITON OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/15/2021:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCITON OF DOCS (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSES TO DEFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF NIKKI EMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JEFFERY RAY BROOKS ON 083021 AT 2:00 (AMENDED) FILED BY PLNTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JERRY W EDWARDS ON 082621 AT 11:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JEFFERY RAY BROOKS ON 082621 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF ALEXANDRA ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF AD.E A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY AN.E A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF N.E. A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS NATURAL GUARDIAN NIKKI EMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF NIKKI EMRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NIKKI EMRICK ON 071921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BARBAR ANN DUNN ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT BARBARA A DUNN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT BARBARA ANN DUNN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Litigation@DennisHernandez.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000241CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALBEE , SCOTT BENNETT