Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 20:01:09 (UTC).

ACCURATE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, VS PEREZ, ALFREDO

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 ACCURATE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEREZ, ALFREDO. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPPE, KRISTIE and KRISTIE RUPPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUPPE, KRISTIE

KRISTIE RUPPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCURATE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC,

Defendant

PEREZ, ALFREDO

 

Court Documents

COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGEMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT WILL BE PREPARED BY PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF TO SEND JUDGEMENT TO COURT IN 2 WEEKS IF CASE IS NOT SETTLED PRIOR TO.

03/05/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGEMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT WILL BE PREPARED BY PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF TO SEND JUDGEMENT TO COURT IN 2 WEEKS IF CASE IS NOT SETTLED PRIOR TO.

SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED - ON ALFREDO PEREZ AT N/A

02/25/2019:SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED - ON ALFREDO PEREZ AT N/A

DOCUMENTS FILED - NEW ADDRESS ON FILE FOR DEF

02/19/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - NEW ADDRESS ON FILE FOR DEF

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ALFREDO PEREZ- PTC 030519 AT 9:30AM

02/19/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ALFREDO PEREZ- PTC 030519 AT 9:30AM

NOTICE OF UNEXECUTED SERVICE

02/07/2019:NOTICE OF UNEXECUTED SERVICE

RETURNED CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL UNSERVED ON ALFRED PEREZ - NTC TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 030519 AT 9:30

02/05/2019:RETURNED CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL UNSERVED ON ALFRED PEREZ - NTC TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 030519 AT 9:30

SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

01/24/2019:SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/24/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/24/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALFREDO PEREZ (CERT)

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALFREDO PEREZ (CERT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGEMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT WILL BE PREPARED BY PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF TO SEND JUDGEMENT TO COURT IN 2 WEEKS IF CASE IS NOT SETTLED PRIOR TO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED - ON ALFREDO PEREZ AT N/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - NEW ADDRESS ON FILE FOR DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ALFREDO PEREZ- PTC 030519 AT 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Payment received: $24.00 Receipt Number H 611298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $24.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 3/5/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE RUPPE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Active Process NOTICE OF PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNEXECUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • Payment received: $199.00 Receipt Number H 607312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $199.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Active Process NOTICE OF PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 3/5/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE RUPPE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $199.00 Balance Remaining $199.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Case 272019SC000236SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Event Date: 03/05/2019 09:30; Judge: RUPPE, KRISTIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Event Date: 03/05/2019 09:30; Judge: RUPPE, KRISTIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less