Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 21:20:03 (UTC).

ACCIARDO, ROSALIE, ASARO, JOSEPHINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 ACCIARDO, ROSALIE, ASARO, JOSEPHINE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Claimant

OAK HILL HOSPITAL

Decedent

ACCIARDO, ROSALIE

Not Classified By Court

ASARO, JOSEPHINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KANE, CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEstate Claim for $1,408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - OAK HILL HOSPITAL $1,408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCOPY REQUEST COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $15.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF LUCILLE ANN ASARO ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 728776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000446CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ROSALIE ACCIARDO (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000355CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OAK HILL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANE, CHRISTINA