This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/01/2019 at 13:16:54 (UTC).

A & M PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPME VS NATHAN, DESMOND

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 A M PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPME filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NATHAN, DESMOND. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A & M PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPME

Defendant

NATHAN, DESMOND

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FOR EVICTION HEARING ON 060319 @ 1:00 PM

05/24/2019:NOTICE FOR EVICTION HEARING ON 060319 @ 1:00 PM

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FROM A & M PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.

05/22/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FROM A & M PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.

RESPONSE TO EVICTION - COPY SENT TO LANDLORD

05/17/2019:RESPONSE TO EVICTION - COPY SENT TO LANDLORD

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON DESMOND NATHAN 051419

05/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON DESMOND NATHAN 051419

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/13/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

05/13/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

05/13/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DESMOND NATHAN (PL)

05/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DESMOND NATHAN (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE FOR EVICTION HEARING ON 060319 @ 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FROM A & M PROPERTIES AND DEVELOPEMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $794.50 Receipt Number H 626988

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $794.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $794.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO EVICTION - COPY SENT TO LANDLORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON DESMOND NATHAN 051419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DESMOND NATHAN (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 625897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Case 272019CC000622CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less