This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/25/2019 at 16:16:24 (UTC).

2015 SEVEN HILLS LLLP VS BAHAR, IMAD Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 2015 SEVEN HILLS LLLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BAHAR, IMAD. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2015 SEVEN HILLS LLLP

Defendants

EL HAJJI, ABDELALI

BAHAR, IMAD

THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTON, HUNTER G

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

04/01/2019:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

04/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS hnorton@slk-law.com

04/01/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS hnorton@slk-law.com

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IMAD BAHAR ~ BLANK

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO IMAD BAHAR ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ABDELALI EL HAJJI ~ BLANK

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ABDELALI EL HAJJI ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE MEDITTERRANEAN DISH LLC ~ BLANK

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE MEDITTERRANEAN DISH LLC ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: IMAD BAHAR

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: IMAD BAHAR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ABDELALI EL HAJJI

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ABDELALI EL HAJJI

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC 040319

04/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC 040319

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON IMAD BAHAR 040319

04/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON IMAD BAHAR 040319

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) AGAINST THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC AND DEFAULT (BLANK)

04/11/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) AGAINST THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC AND DEFAULT (BLANK)

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

04/11/2019:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AS TO COUNT 1 (POSSESSION)

04/16/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AS TO COUNT 1 (POSSESSION)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) FILED BY PLNTF

04/16/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC AND IMAD BAHAR

04/17/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC AND IMAD BAHAR

JUDGMENT FILED - FJ AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) AGAINST DEF, THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC DTD 041719

04/17/2019:JUDGMENT FILED - FJ AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) AGAINST DEF, THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC DTD 041719

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - FJ AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) AGAINST DEF, THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC DTD 041719

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC AND IMAD BAHAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AS TO COUNT 1 (POSSESSION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION) AGAINST THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC AND DEFAULT (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON IMAD BAHAR 040319

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC 040319

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THE MEDITERRANEAN DELISH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THE MEDITTERRANEAN DISH LLC ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ABDELALI EL HAJJI ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO IMAD BAHAR ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS hnorton@slk-law.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA000384CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORTON, HUNTER