This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/16/2022 at 20:02:07 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS GRANT G TURNER Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GRANT G TURNER. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

GRANT G TURNER

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRANT G TURN

PAULETTE TURNER

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIN-DUNCAN, KARISSA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

04/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

04/25/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

04/25/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

04/25/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

04/25/2022:CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GRANT G TURNER

04/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GRANT G TURNER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRANT G TURNER

04/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRANT G TURNER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PAULETTE TURNER aka PAULETTE ROMAIN

04/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PAULETTE TURNER aka PAULETTE ROMAIN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

04/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

04/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $973.50 Receipt Number MX 2022004159

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $973.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: PAULETTE TURNER aka PAULETTE ROMAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRANT G TURNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: GRANT G TURNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $973.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000242CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chin-Duncan, Karissa, ESQ.