Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 06/30/2019 at 22:01:03 (UTC).

TWIN LAKES MOBILE HOME ESTATES VS BOONE, BRENDA ANN

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 TWIN LAKES MOBILE HOME ESTATES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BOONE, BRENDA ANN. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWIN LAKES MOBILE HOME ESTATES

Defendant

BOONE, BRENDA ANN

Not Classified By Court

FRANKLIN, BRENDA A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 7/18/19@9AM/COPIES MAILED TO PARTIES

06/27/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 7/18/19@9AM/COPIES MAILED TO PARTIES

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: BRENDA BOONE ON 6/13/19

06/13/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: BRENDA BOONE ON 6/13/19

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: BRENDA BOONE/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: BRENDA BOONE/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

06/10/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

ANSWER

06/03/2019:ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 7/18/19@9AM/COPIES MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Event EH scheduled on 7/18/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Payment received: $1,013.50 Receipt Number MX 2019008203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $1,013.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1,013.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: BRENDA BOONE ON 6/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: BRENDA BOONE/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case 262019CC000261CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Event Date: 07/18/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: EH; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less