This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/03/2022 at 09:50:54 (UTC).

THE HOWARD E HILL FOUNDATION I VS ADORNO, JOSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2008 THE HOWARD E HILL FOUNDATION I filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ADORNO, JOSE. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, NICHOLAS RUSSELL, GREIDER, CHRISTINE H and THOMPSON, NICHOLAS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, NICHOLAS RUSSELL

GREIDER, CHRISTINE H

THOMPSON, NICHOLAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HOWARD E HILL FOUNDATION I

Defendants

ADORNO, JOSE

RODRIGUEZ, ELINA E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS, JOHN JAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2011
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/16/2011 11:00; Judge: THOMPSON, NICHOLAS R; Docket Type: FS; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL EXPENSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FILED & RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE FILED (2/16/11) (HG BOX)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE FILED & RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 1/27/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLEADINGS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2009
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RET.SERVED & FILED DIR TO: ELINA E RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketATTORNEY WATKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELINA E RODRIGUEZ RETURN TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS RET UNSERVED & FILED DIR TO: ELINA E RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS RET UNSERVED & FILED DIR TO: JOSE ADORNO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO:JOSE ADORNO/RTD TO JJW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO:ELINA RODRIGUEZ/RTD TO JJW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOWARD E HILL FOUNDATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS, JOHN JAY