Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 03/15/2021 at 20:04:08 (UTC).

STANLEY LYNN, KATHLEEN C VS BETANCOURT, ROSA

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 STANLEY LYNN, KATHLEEN C filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BETANCOURT, ROSA. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANLEY LYNN, KATHLEEN C

Defendant

BETANCOURT, ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS, JOHN JAY

 

Court Documents

Return of Service Served: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 2/22/2021

02/23/2021:Return of Service Served: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 2/22/2021

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 2/22/2021

02/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 2/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

02/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

02/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

02/18/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

02/18/2021:PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/18/2021:VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

02/18/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Served: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 2/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 2/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number MX 2021001783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $935.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCase 262021CA000086CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less