Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 06/30/2019 at 22:01:16 (UTC).

STANAHAN INC. (MATHEW R. STANT VS REARDON, CHARLOTTE SUE

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 STANAHAN INC MATHEW R STANT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against REARDON, CHARLOTTE SUE. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANAHAN INC. (MATHEW R. STANT

Defendant

REARDON, CHARLOTTE SUE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

06/10/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: CHARLOTTE REARDON ON 6/13/19

06/14/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: CHARLOTTE REARDON ON 6/13/19

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHARLOTTE REARDON/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHARLOTTE REARDON/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: CHARLOTTE REARDON ON 6/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHARLOTTE REARDON/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007266

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case 262019CC000260CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less