This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 19:00:29 (UTC).

SIERRA, GAUDIE VS RICHMAN PROPERTY SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SIERRA, GAUDIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHMAN PROPERTY SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIERRA, GAUDIE

Defendant

RICHMAN PROPERTY SERVICE, INC.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

12/06/2019:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: MIRAVERDE/RICHMAN PROP INC ON 12/11/19

12/12/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: MIRAVERDE/RICHMAN PROP INC ON 12/11/19

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RICHMAN PROPERTY "MIRA VERDE"/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE/MAILED COPY TO PLAINTIFF

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RICHMAN PROPERTY "MIRA VERDE"/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE/MAILED COPY TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: MIRAVERDE/RICHMAN PROP INC ON 12/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RICHMAN PROPERTY "MIRA VERDE"/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE/MAILED COPY TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Active Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Active Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Case 262019SC000570SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/22/2020 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 2ND FL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.