This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/06/2022 at 20:06:03 (UTC).

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK VS AEGIS VENTURE FUND LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AEGIS VENTURE FUND LLC. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN, SLOAN, JAMES D and JAMES SLOAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

JAMES SLOAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

AFLX LLC

Defendants

SUGAR TOWN LLC

BARMAT, MARC P

MIMOSA HOLDINGS LTD

ATIO USA LLC

BRENZINI, GINO

GEROSA, GUIDO FAUSTO

ALBANI, LUCIO MEDOLAGO

AEGIS VENTURE FUND LLC

TENANT IN POSSESSION NO 1, UNK

TENANT IN POSSESSION NO 2, UNK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRUNSPAN, ALAN MICHAEL

QUINN, MICHAEL PATRICK

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

06/06/2022:MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

MOTION OF CARLTON FIELDS, P.A. TO WITHDRAW FROM THE CASE

06/06/2022:MOTION OF CARLTON FIELDS, P.A. TO WITHDRAW FROM THE CASE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL) **SHOW CAUSE HR SET FOR 6/8/2022 @ 9:50 AM - In Person**

05/23/2022:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL) **SHOW CAUSE HR SET FOR 6/8/2022 @ 9:50 AM - In Person**

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NO. 2

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NO. 2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NO. 1

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NO. 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SUGAR TOWN, LLC

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SUGAR TOWN, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MIMOSA HOLDINGS, LTD

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MIMOSA HOLDINGS, LTD

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARC P. BARMAT

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARC P. BARMAT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LUCIO MEDOLAGO ALBANI

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LUCIO MEDOLAGO ALBANI

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GUIDO FAUSTO GEROSA

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GUIDO FAUSTO GEROSA

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GINO BRENZINI

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GINO BRENZINI

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ATIO USA, LLC

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ATIO USA, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: AEGIS VENTURE FUND, LLC

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: AEGIS VENTURE FUND, LLC

VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

05/17/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

05/17/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

05/17/2022:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

05/17/2022:PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

05/17/2022:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/08/2022 09:50; Judge: SLOAN, JAMES D; Docket Type: HR; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 3RD FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION OF CARLTON FIELDS, P.A. TO WITHDRAW FROM THE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent HR scheduled on 6/8/2022 at 0950 AM, MX - Judge JAMES SLOAN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL) **SHOW CAUSE HR SET FOR 6/8/2022 @ 9:50 AM - In Person**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NO. 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NO. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: SUGAR TOWN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MIMOSA HOLDINGS, LTD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARC P. BARMAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (W/ PO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $2,061.50 Receipt Number MX 2022004957

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $2,061.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $2,061.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000278CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATIO USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINN , MICHAEL PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grunspan, Alan Michael