This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 02/27/2019 at 03:16:23 (UTC).

SAN MARTY, ILLILIAN Et Al VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 SAN MARTY, ILLILIAN filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAN MARTY, ILLILIAN

SAN MARTY, JOSE

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECHERT, CHARLES HAROLD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/13/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

02/13/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

01/24/2019:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

01/24/2019:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT

01/24/2019:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF FILED ADJUSTER/ESTIMATOR

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF FILED ADJUSTER/ESTIMATOR

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

01/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

Designation of Email

01/24/2019:Designation of Email

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

01/24/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2019001077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF FILED ADJUSTER/ESTIMATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Designation of Email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Case 262019CA000069CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bechert, Charles H, III