This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/04/2019 at 18:00:25 (UTC).

RTO NATIONAL, LLC. VS PAYNE, JAMES

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 RTO NATIONAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAYNE, JAMES. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTO NATIONAL, LLC.

Defendant

PAYNE, JAMES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JAMES PAYNE/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JAMES PAYNE/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

06/11/2019:DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM (REPLEVIN(

06/11/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM (REPLEVIN(

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: JAMES PAYNE ON 6/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JAMES PAYNE/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Active Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Payment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $395.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $395.00 Balance Remaining $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM (REPLEVIN(

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case 262019SC000264SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RTO NATIONAL LLC is a litigant