This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 07/20/2019 at 20:05:20 (UTC).

RADCLIFFE, JESSICA VS ALLEN, PENNY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 RADCLIFFE, JESSICA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLEN, PENNY. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RADCLIFFE, JESSICA

Defendants

TURCO, PAIGE

ALLEN, PENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMM, PETER WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PENNY ALLEN

07/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PENNY ALLEN

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PAIGE TURCO

07/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PAIGE TURCO

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/02/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/02/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/02/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

Designation of Email

07/02/2019:Designation of Email

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

07/02/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PENNY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PAIGE TURCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Designation of Email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 262019CA000467CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kamm, Peter William