This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 03/02/2019 at 18:01:52 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO VS CASALE, CHRISTOPHER A Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASALE, CHRISTOPHER A. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO

Defendants

CASALE, CHRISTOPHER A

PAGE THREE ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREITNER, JORDAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

02/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

02/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PAGE THREE ENTERPRISES, INC./EMAILED ATTNY

02/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PAGE THREE ENTERPRISES, INC./EMAILED ATTNY

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHRISTOPHER CASALE/EMAILED ATTNY

02/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHRISTOPHER CASALE/EMAILED ATTNY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/06/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONE APPEARANCE

02/06/2019:MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONE APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 3/20/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number MX 2019001673

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONE APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHRISTOPHER CASALE/EMAILED ATTNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PAGE THREE ENTERPRISES, INC./EMAILED ATTNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000068SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/6/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 03/20/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Breitner, Jordan