This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 11:14:21 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS HOPKINS, WILLIAM L

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOPKINS, WILLIAM L. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL, HILL, DARRELL R and HILL, DARRELL ROBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

HILL, DARRELL ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

HOPKINS, WILLIAM L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

ROSEN, JOSEPH F

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED

02/17/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER 2/19/2020 (EMAILED TO ATTY/MAILED TO DEFENDANT)

01/27/2020:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER 2/19/2020 (EMAILED TO ATTY/MAILED TO DEFENDANT)

Return of Service Unserved- WILLIAM HOPKINS ON 12-21-19

12/21/2019:Return of Service Unserved- WILLIAM HOPKINS ON 12-21-19

Order on Motion FOR TELEPOHONIC HEARING

12/09/2019:Order on Motion FOR TELEPOHONIC HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Proposed Order

12/06/2019:Proposed Order

MOTION

12/06/2019:MOTION

Designation of Email

12/06/2019:Designation of Email

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/19/2020 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 2ND FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PT on 2/19/2020 0900 AM Judge DARRELL HILL results Cancelled on 2/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 2/19/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER 2/19/2020 (EMAILED TO ATTY/MAILED TO DEFENDANT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/22/2020 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 2ND FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved- WILLIAM HOPKINS ON 12-21-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion FOR TELEPOHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: WILLIAM HOPKINS/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019015202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000574SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less