This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/27/2022 at 20:02:57 (UTC).

PAUL, BRYAN W VS LOFTIN, ANDREW AUSTIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 PAUL, BRYAN W filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against LOFTIN, ANDREW AUSTIN. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES DEAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL, BRYAN W

Defendants

PAUL, AMY LYNN

LOFTIN, ANDREW AUSTIN

PAUL, BRITTANY LAGROW

PAULL, BRYAN W II

PAUL, CATINA LYNN

PAUL, HAYS R

PAUL, JAMES C

LOFTIN, SHANNON P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER, MATTHEW DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER IS CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE 20TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $480.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005455

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $480.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: SHANNON P. LOFTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAMES C. PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAYS R. PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CATINA LYNN PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRYAN W. PAUL, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRITTANY LAGROW PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANDREW AUSTIN LOFTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: AMY LYNN PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO MODIFY THE BRYAN PAUL IRREVOCABLE TRUST DATED OCTOBER 17, 1980

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $480.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000305CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less