This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 02/27/2019 at 02:29:03 (UTC).

NELSON CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABI VS STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY C

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 NELSON CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY C. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABI

Defendant

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN KEUREN, PETER SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

01/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

01/09/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY/emailed attny

01/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY/emailed attny

Return of Service Served DIR TO: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY

02/02/2019:Return of Service Served DIR TO: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

02/14/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

Designation of Email

02/14/2019:Designation of Email

Motion to Invoke the Rules of Civil Procedure

02/14/2019:Motion to Invoke the Rules of Civil Procedure

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/14/2019:DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/15/2019:AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

AGREED ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/19/2019:AGREED ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated Event PT on 2/20/2019 0900 AM Judge DARRELL HILL results Cancelled on 2/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated Event PT on 2/20/2019 0900 AM Judge DARRELL HILL results Cancelled on 2/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke the Rules of Civil Procedure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Served DIR TO: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 2/20/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY/emailed attny

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019000406

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000018SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/9/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/20/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nelson Chiropractic & Rehabilitation, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN KEUREN, PETER SCOTT